+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Held in House
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref FIN)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Leff flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Leff flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-25 fin_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-22 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 29, 2010: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 12
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
March 15, 2010: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 8, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2010: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2