+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:25PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (6)
May 2, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2022: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2022: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 12
February 10, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
January 20, 2022: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor