+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 165
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Amendment: bill passed dpa by s/v 43-5
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Insurance and Retirement: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Insurance and Retirement
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:09 pm
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2013: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
April 2, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor