+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military & Veterans Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 23, 2020: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor