+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
March 3, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2015: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 26, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2015: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor