+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
On April 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:15 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
5-9 as vetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
2-1 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
4-25 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 2, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 5
April 2, 2007: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2007: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor