+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:36PM.
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 20, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor