+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 304
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Government: Withdrawn
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On April 1, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref GOV)
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Government Institutions - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Leff flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Institutions - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Leff flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-31 gov_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
2-23 gov_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 28, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
April 7, 2010: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
April 1, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 29, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
January 28, 2010: Government Institutions: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1