+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:26PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 29, 2019: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor