+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-4 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 25, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor