+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: PSHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
February 19, 2008: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor