+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 346
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment substituted: Floor Amend to Bill - Chabin
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to Chabin Floor Amend to Bill - Jones
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 23, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Jones SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the Chabin Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
5-16 approp_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
5-2 approp_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
Jones SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the Chabin Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-2 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
May 3, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
April 30, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2012: Agriculture and Water: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 21, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
January 24, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor