+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Barto flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
January 20, 2022: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor