+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 232
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: RULES (ref FIN)
- Amendment adopted: Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) (sub FIN)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) (sub FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) (sub FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-20 fin_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 5, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 28, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 27, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 27, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 20, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
January 24, 2012: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor