+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:41PM.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 15
February 27, 2023: House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 11
February 20, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
January 26, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2023: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor