+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (10)
May 6, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 7
May 6, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
February 23, 2016: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2016: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2016: Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 21, 2016: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor