+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 44
- Action: Signed
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 1:43 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-2 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 15, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 16, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 24, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1