+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture, Water and Lands
- House first read
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:40 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources: Do pass
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
January 27, 2015: Natural Resources: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor