+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- House first read
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 2:45 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2011: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7