+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 9, 2015: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6