+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 12, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: FAILED
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- Amended by APPROP - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: withdrawn.
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: failed to pass.
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:21PM.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
June 12, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 42
March 20, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
March 20, 2023: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 5
March 20, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 15, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 11
January 26, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 26, 2023: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 26, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor