+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Held
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PSMT (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Smith flr amend (ref PSMT)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Smith flr amend (ref PSMT) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
February 16, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor