+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator klein motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass sb 1222 on third reading on march 5, 2012. motion carried.
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading on reconsideration
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Klein flr amend (ref Bill) (sub GR)
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Government Reform: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Klein flr amend (ref Bill) (sub GR) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2012: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
January 24, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor