+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 234
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:31 pm
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Third read: Passed
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-24 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
1-29 approp_aspassedcommittee
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 23, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
February 20, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 20, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 30, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1