+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 2
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Third read: Passed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
1-24 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (3)
January 30, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1