+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 166
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Hendrix
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Leff Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Hendrix Floor amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Hendrix Floor amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 20, 2010: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
April 13, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
March 15, 2010: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
January 28, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor