+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 28
- Action: Signed
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 7, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:00 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
- Education (K-12): Do pass
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Johnson flr amend (ref EDK12) (sub RULES)
- Amendment: RULES (ref EDK12)
- Amendment adopted: EDK12 (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Education K-12: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Education K-12 - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Johnson Floor Amendment; reference to EDK12 Amendment; substitute to RULES amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education K-12 - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education K-12 - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Johnson Floor Amendment; reference to EDK12 Amendment; substitute to RULES amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education K-12 - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-25 k12 strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
2-29 strikermemo-caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
3-13 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
March 18, 2008: Education (K-12): Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 18, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
March 12, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2008: Education K-12: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor