+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 80 e
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
April 7, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 8, 2010: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 22, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2010: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor