+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 249
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Court
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
- House first read
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 9:55 am
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Court Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-19 approp_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
Court Floor Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-14 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
April 18, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2011: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
March 10, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
March 2, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
January 24, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3