+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:01PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Banking and Insurance Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Banking and Insurance Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
February 27, 2018: House Banking and Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 27, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 22, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 18, 2018: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor