+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Amendment: RULES (ref HEALTH)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref HEALTH) (sub RULES)
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Leff flr amend (ref HEALTH) (sub RULES) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
January 28, 2010: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor