+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 11:10AM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 21, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 17
January 18, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor