+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 23
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:00 pm
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Griffin flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-28 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
2-13 cem_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
March 20, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2013: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 11, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor