+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:45PM.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
May 26, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 13
February 25, 2021: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 25, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 4, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
January 20, 2021: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor