+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules
- Hhs
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- House first read
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2011: Banking and Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor