+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:20PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2020: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 25, 2020: House Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 13, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
January 23, 2020: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor