+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: withdrawn.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fann flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:35PM.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 22, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
February 22, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 20, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
January 24, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1