+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Kaiser motioned that the House extend its action of May 2, whereby it passed the motion to reconsider its final reading action of Senate Bill 1211 within 14 days and that the time for reconsideration be extednded another 14 days. Motion passed v/v.: PASSED
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Kaiser motion that the House extend the reconsideration motion another 14 days
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Kaiser motioned that the House reconsider Senate Bill 1211 within 14 days. Motion passed v/v.
- Third read in House: FAILED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:30PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Education Committee: withdrawn.
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Marsh to include the Marsh floor amendment (ref ED) and exclude the Barto floor amendment (ref ED)
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Marsh flr amend (ref ED) failed
- Barto flr amend (ref ED) adopted
- Boyer flr amend (ref ED) adopted
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 30
March 16, 2022: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
March 16, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 14, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
January 18, 2022: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor