+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Transmit to House
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:17 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2012: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor