+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 84
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:43 pmobject
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:17 pm
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-21 jud_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
Farnsworth Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
1-30 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
March 21, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 20, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
February 20, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 20, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 9, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 23, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1