+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 15, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
- Kaiser flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 4
January 30, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 30, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 30, 2023: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor