+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Senate concurred.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Boyer - passed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Allen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (4)
Allen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Boyer - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 4, 2016: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2016: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
March 30, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 12
March 30, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
March 8, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 8, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2016: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 29, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
February 29, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
January 21, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
January 21, 2016: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor