+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 41
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:07 pm
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:45 pm
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2011: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor