+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:30 pmobject
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: NRT (ref Bill)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-15 nrt_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2011: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
January 24, 2011: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor