+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Gray flr amend (ref Bill)
- Final disposition: Substituted House bill on third reading
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:45 pmobject
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Gray flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gray flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
January 24, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor