+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 108
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:48 pmobject
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Leff Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-29 ced
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 13, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
March 15, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor