+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 229
- Action: Signed
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- Transmit to House
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate adopts conference committee
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate reports to conference committee
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- House reports to conference committee
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House appointed: Mitchell, Friese, Petersen
- Recommendation: that the bill be accepted as originally passed by the Senate and be further amended.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Burges, Griffin, Mcguire
- Conference committee recommended
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Brophy McGee
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- House first read
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: WE (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Griffin flr amend (ref WE)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Water and Energy: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Water and Energy
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Water and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Water and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref WE) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Brophy McGee - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 2, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
April 2, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
March 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 9, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2015: Water and Energy: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor