+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 303
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Water and Energy: Do pass
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Water and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
1-29 approp-ced
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2010: Water and Energy: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2010: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 22, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor