+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:20PM.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 26, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
March 15, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 15, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 9, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
January 24, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor