+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: JUD
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to JUD - Farnsworth
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gallego #1
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Committee of the Whole:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref JUD)
- Amendment adopted: Gould flr amend (ref JUD)
- Amendment failed: Gallardo #1 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Gallardo #2 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Committee of the Whole:
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth Substitute Floor Amendment to the Judiciary Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-8 jud_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Gould flr amend (ref JUD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-14 jud_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
3-7 jud_aspassed_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 14, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 24, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor